THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:29:38 AM
Kohli, Kapil
CPSO#:
96000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16715 Yonge Street Unit 22B
Newmarket ON L3X 1X4
Phone: (905) 898-4184
Fax: (905) 898-5793
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAPIL KOHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2014 |