THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:39:25 AM
Chow, Elaine Stephanie
CPSO#:
95991
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |