THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:17:35 AM
Harmon, John Paul
CPSO#:
95984
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7314
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Manitoulin Health Centre |
Little Current |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL HARMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2011 to 22 Jul 2011
EL - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Jan 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2013 |