THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:38:14 PM
Ray, Lawrie Jean Marion
CPSO#:
95983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hamilton, Lawrie Jean Marion (used until: 19 Feb 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAWRIE JEAN MARION RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2011
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
EL - Trauma General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2018 |