THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:41:05 AM
Strike, Melanie Katherine
CPSO#:
95936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Ctr
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: 6137226521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE KATHERINE STRIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |