THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:08:21 PM
Voinov, Valentin
CPSO#:
95935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Medical University of Debrecen, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |