THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:23:58 AM
Gregorovich, Sandra Fabiana
CPSO#:
95919
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
14 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-Jan-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Gregorovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 14 Jan 2023 |