THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:06:39 PM
Hussein, Haseena
CPSO#:
95894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57337
Fax: 905-494-6492
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASEENA HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2015 |