THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:07:40 AM
Wilton, Kelly
CPSO#:
95883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
311 Woolwich Street
Unit C
Guelph ON N1H 3W4
Phone: 5193413344
Fax: 5193414433
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:31 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KELLY WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |