THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:37:48 PM
Mondoux, Shawn
CPSO#:
95866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N4A6
Phone: 9055221155
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:22 Jul 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN MONDOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONDOUX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2016 |