THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:54:34 AM
Wilson, Jennifer Lyn Clandinan
CPSO#:
95844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYN CLANDINAN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2016 |