THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:22:15 PM
Thomas, Neil William Douglas
CPSO#:
95838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
75 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL WILLIAM DOUGLAS THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2018 |