THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:17:35 AM
Ghoreishi Nejad Esfarjani, Mahsa
CPSO#:
95827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Isfahan University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
688A East River Road
New Glasgow NS B2H 3S1
Phone: (902) 752-3632 Ext. 4739
Fax: (902) 755-5532
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:One Health Clinic
300 Rossland Road
Ajax, ON L1Z 0M1
Date Received: 30 May 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHSA GHOREISHI NEJAD ESFARJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOREISHI NEJAD ESFARJANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2013 |