THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:55:27 PM
Hoffer, Darryl Nolan
CPSO#:
95824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 Aug 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARRYL NOLAN HOFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |