THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:17:07 PM
Czilli, Tiffany
CPSO#:
95814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
Phone: 519-944-4449
Fax: 226-674-0778
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIFFANY CZILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZILLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2014 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 25 Mar 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 25 Mar 2024 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2023
Summary:
On March 24, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Czilli committed professional misconduct in that the governing body of another health profession (the Ontario College of Pharmacists) found that she committed an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct under s. 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or as defined in the regulations. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Czilli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Czilli attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Czilli’s certificate of registration for 12 months commencing March 25, 2023;
3. Dr. Czilli pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 24, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-03-24
Concerns
Source:
Canadian Medical Regulatory Authorities
Active Date: October 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On October 21, 2020, the Discipline Committee of the Ontario College of Pharmacists made findings of professional misconduct against Tiffany Czilli including, among other things, falsification of pharmacy records, signing or issuing in her professional capacity a document that she knew contained a false or misleading statement, submission of an account or charges for services that she knew was a false or misleading statement, and failure to keep required records. The Discipline Committee ordered the following: (a) that Dr. Czilli successfully complete the ProBE program, (b) suspension of Dr. Czilli’s pharmacist certificate for a period of 11-12 months (depending on completion of the ProBE program), (c) that Dr. Czilli is prohibited for a period of 3 years from acting as a designated manager of any pharmacy and from having a proprietary interest in any pharmacy, and (d) that Dr. Czilli be reprimanded.