THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:06:54 AM
Tharmalingam, Senthuran
CPSO#:
95788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospi
Department of Surgery
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Phone: 5198422101
Fax: 5198429668
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 6, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Senthuran Tharmalingam's privileges were reinstated at Kingston General Hospital, Hotel Dieu Hospital and Providence Care, effective May 6, 2016.
On February 8, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Senthuran Tharmalingam's privileges were temporarily suspended at Kingston General Hospital, Hotel Dieu Hospital and Providence Care, effective February 5, 2016.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SENTHURAN THARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)