THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:18:05 AM
Zufelt, Ryan David
CPSO#:
95785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 46823
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN DAVID ZUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUFELT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |