THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:44:20 AM
Gandhi, Sumeet
CPSO#:
95766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Road, 2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUMEET GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |