THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:31:19 AM
Lee, Hubert Tsun-Yin
CPSO#:
95758
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway W
The Mississauga Hospital / Trillium
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUBERT TSUN-YIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator Program
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator Program
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2021 |