THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:59:45 AM
Pooni, Amandeep Singh
CPSO#:
95716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
840 Coxwell Avenue,
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 461 0165
Fax: (416) 461 5705
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Colorectal Surgery |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDEEP SINGH POONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POONI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Dec 2019
CF - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |