THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:58:55 AM
Lopez Bueno, Javier Antonio
CPSO#:
95709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
14 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidad De Cartagena, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ONT
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAVIER ANTONIO LOPEZ BUENO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LOPEZ BUENO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;
(2) Dr. LOPEZ BUENO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LOPEZ BUENO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LOPEZ BUENO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LOPEZ BUENO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LOPEZ BUENO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2023 to 05 Jun 2023
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2023 to 14 Feb 2024
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2024 to 14 Mar 2024
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Pediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |