THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:21:43 PM
Beckford, Claudine Gerrilyn
CPSO#:
95705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
James, Claudine Gerrilyn (used until: 13 Sep 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 718
Suite 300-29 Main St. West
Beeton ON L0G 1A0
Phone: 905-729-4888
Fax: 855-386-2608
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDINE GERRILYN BECKFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Apr 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2015 |