THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:04:43 AM
Giles, Keely Elise McMillan Johnston
CPSO#:
95700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carling Broadview Medical Centre
770 Broadview Ave- Suite 305
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Fax: 613728-5848
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEELY ELISE MCMILLAN JOHNSTON GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 21 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2013 |