THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:32:58 AM
Wadsworth, Kristin Marie
CPSO#:
95673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1174 King St E
Cambridge ON N3H 3P6
Phone: 519-219-4500
Fax: 519-340-1404
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE WADSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADSWORTH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 07 Feb 2017 to 10 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2016 |