THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:52:27 PM
Tsui, Hubert Brian Young
CPSO#:
95671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, B204
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 89322
Fax: 416-480-6035
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUBERT BRIAN YOUNG TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |