THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:18:23 AM
Scott, Courtney Anne
CPSO#:
95661
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street, Room A100
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212 Ext. 7721
Fax: 9058832246
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COURTNEY ANNE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2017 |