THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:32:33 PM
Rahmdel, Behnam
CPSO#:
95656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Rod, Behnam (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )
Rahmdel, Behnam (used until: 15 Aug 2012 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9-9080 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 763-9400
Fax: (905) 763-9600
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEHNAM RAHMDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMDEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2015 |