THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:37:47 AM
Jensen, Lorraine Frances
CPSO#:
95640
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 905-684-6411
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORRAINE FRANCES JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2015 |