THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:29:59 PM
Enzevaei, Atoosa
CPSO#:
95635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATOOSA ENZEVAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENZEVAEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2014 |