THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:44:18 AM
Shehata, Fady Fouad Amin
CPSO#:
95629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Obstetrics & Gynecology Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (647) 372-0152
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FADY FOUAD AMIN SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |