THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:55:21 PM
Witt, Jonathan Derek
CPSO#:
95625
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DEREK WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2014 |