THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:59:37 AM
Lalani, Nafisha
CPSO#:
95609
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Princess Margaret Cancer Center
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 14 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAFISHA LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2021 |