THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:49:17 AM
Schantz, Daryl Ivan
CPSO#:
95593
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Manitoba, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |