THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:45:29 PM
Kay, Emily Susan
CPSO#:
95574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
804 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY SUSAN KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2016 |