THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:24:56 AM
Jacoby, Lynn Marie
CPSO#:
95520
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Michigan, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Appletree Medical Group
104-1902 Robertson Rd
Ottawa ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 31 Jul 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:20 Sep 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2017 |