THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 4:01:40 AM
Grebenyuk, Liliya
CPSO#:
95519
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Kazakh State Medical University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILIYA GREBENYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREBENYUK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2014 |