THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:56:00 PM
Ferreria, Sharon Grace
CPSO#:
95516
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON N4S 6N6
Phone: (519) 421-4223
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. G. Ferreria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON GRACE FERRERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRERIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |