THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:31:30 AM
Alarie, Andrea Felicia
CPSO#:
95482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mousseau, Andrea Felicia (used until: 21 Jun 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Ave W
A & L OBGYN
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Suite 206
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: 5197448561
Fax: 5197443089
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:20 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA FELICIA ALARIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 04 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 04 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 21 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |