THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:46:55 PM
Belisle, Sheena Rose-Meline
CPSO#:
95462
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Jul 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:12 Feb 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHEENA ROSE-MELINE BELISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELISLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Oct 2017 to 12 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2018 |