THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:56:34 AM
Nowik, Christina Mau
CPSO#:
95427
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 26 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 24 Oct 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2019 to 01 Nov 2019
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2019 |