THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:04:53 AM
Knibutat, Darren Batram
CPSO#:
95422
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Vascular And Interventional
Radiology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2381
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2013 |
|
Active |