THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:20:37 PM
Lalonde, Sebastien
CPSO#:
95397
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |