THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:51:32 AM
Snelgrove, John Wilkinson
CPSO#:
95395
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
3rd Floor, Rm. 3-914
Toronto ON M5G1Z5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 2701
Fax: 416-586-8740
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WILKINSON SNELGROVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELGROVE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |