THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:36:15 AM
Blonde, Kenneth Andrew
CPSO#:
95386
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Critical Care
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH ANDREW BLONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLONDE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |