THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:55:27 AM
Mirham, Lorna
CPSO#:
95381
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mirham, Lorna Magdi Lamei Khalil (used until: 31 May 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566253
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORNA MIRHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Jun 2017
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2016 |