THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:30:31 AM
Hundt, Penelope Kate
CPSO#:
95361
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Apr 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2012 |