THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:46:59 AM
Noyahr, Lori-Anne Alcantara
CPSO#:
95343
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Birchm
Department of Anesthesia
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORI-ANNE ALCANTARA NOYAHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOYAHR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2016 |