THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:56:02 AM
Wesley, Jennifer Liz Catherine
CPSO#:
95339
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
48 Hillside Rd
Highway 540
Noojmowin Teg Health Centre
Aundeck Omni Kaning First Nation
Little Current ON P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-0083
Fax: (705) 368-3922
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LIZ CATHERINE WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |