THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:24:55 AM
Rayar, Praveen Keshava
CPSO#:
95334
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10145 McVean Dr
ErinoakKids Centre for Treatment an
Brampton ON L6P 4K7
Phone: 905 855 2690
Fax: 794 3267
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:ErinoakKids
10145 McVean Drive
Brampton ON L6P 4K7
208-178 John Street Brampton ON L6W 2A4
Date Received: 12 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Developmental Pediatrics |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRAVEEN KESHAVA RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2022 |