THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:30:31 AM
Manian, Usha Deivanai
CPSO#:
95317
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
K-W Cardiopulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: (519)741 5252
Fax: (519) 741 5772
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:17 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. USHA DEIVANAI MANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2016 |